THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:20:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine
2nd Floor
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 274-7066
Fax: (905) 274-0227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Forrester (CPSO#: 31303 )
Business Address: 333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
(905) 274-7055
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
Valley House 2nd Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine
2nd Floor
333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 274-7066
Fax: (905) 274-0227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis H. Forrester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Forrester (CPSO#: 31303 )
Business Address: 333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
(905) 274-7055
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
Valley House 2nd Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS HUGH GEORGE FORRESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORRESTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS HUGH GEORGE FORRESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORRESTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978