THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:22:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Delva (CPSO#: 31100 ) Dr. N. Delva (CPSO#: 31316 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3522
Business Address: 220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
(613) 533-9303
Business Address: 72 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Delva (CPSO#: 31100 ) Dr. N. Delva (CPSO#: 31316 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3400 Extn: 3522
Business Address: 220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3G2
(613) 533-9303
Business Address: 72 Bruyere Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C8
(613) 241-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOHN DELVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOHN DELVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 1980

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975