THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:18:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E 207
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804748
Fax: 4164806856
Address: Suite 4022
3080 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Phone: 647 347 6644
Fax: 647 347 6647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Joyner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Joyner (CPSO#: 31413 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E205
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4748
Business Address: 4022-3080 Yonge St
Lawrence Park Cardiology
Toronto ON M4N 3N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
E 207
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804748
Fax: 4164806856
Address: Suite 4022
3080 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M4N 3N1
Phone: 647 347 6644
Fax: 647 347 6647

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.C. Joyner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Joyner (CPSO#: 31413 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E205
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4748
Business Address: 4022-3080 Yonge St
Lawrence Park Cardiology
Toronto ON M4N 3N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN CAMPBELL JOYNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN CAMPBELL JOYNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 1980

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976