THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Sprucewood Drive
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 804-1885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: Suite 611 - 581 Davis Drive, Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6, Tel: 905-853-4448.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Ian Soutter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Down (CPSO#: 32556 ) Dr. D. Soutter (CPSO#: 31457 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 804-1885
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(416) 804-1885

Corporation Name: Nancy K. Down Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Down (CPSO#: 32556 ) Dr. D. Soutter (CPSO#: 31457 )
Business Address: 218 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 491-0345

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Sprucewood Drive
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 804-1885
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record can contact: Suite 611 - 581 Davis Drive, Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6, Tel: 905-853-4448.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Ian Soutter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Down (CPSO#: 32556 ) Dr. D. Soutter (CPSO#: 31457 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 804-1885
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(416) 804-1885

Corporation Name: Nancy K. Down Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Down (CPSO#: 32556 ) Dr. D. Soutter (CPSO#: 31457 )
Business Address: 218 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 491-0345

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD IAN SOUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD IAN SOUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978