THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 225-5650
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
Phone: 613 727 6201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, Tel: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 06 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Byrne (CPSO#: 31480 ) Dr. D. Manseau (CPSO#: 44059 )
Business Address: 1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
(613) 325-2905
Business Address: 1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
(613) 727-6201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1865 Baseline Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 225-5650
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
Phone: 613 727 6201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd., Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3, Tel: 1-800-775-0093.
Date Received: 06 Oct 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray O'Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. O'Byrne (CPSO#: 31480 ) Dr. D. Manseau (CPSO#: 44059 )
Business Address: 1865 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3K6
(613) 325-2905
Business Address: 1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
(613) 727-6201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAY W L O'BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BYRNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAY W L O'BYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BYRNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1980