THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:59:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: 7054355131

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RICHARD SIMMS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Simms Omylanowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: 7054355131

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RICHARD SIMMS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Simms Omylanowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2010


DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1977