THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:20:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Drive
PDS Imaging
Suite B23
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2766
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weisbrod (CPSO#: 31493 )
Business Address: 106 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Address: 3-34 Fraserwood Ave
North York ON M6B 2N5
6477079707

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Drive
PDS Imaging
Suite B23
Toronto Ontario M3J 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2766
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Weisbrod (CPSO#: 31493 )
Business Address: 106 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Address: 3-34 Fraserwood Ave
North York ON M6B 2N5
6477079707

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE HOWARD WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE HOWARD WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978