THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:55:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-8098
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd
Unit 1924
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre Orlean
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
Phone: 613 749 1242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1355 Bank St
suite 502
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 6135135797
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.A.S. Taucer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taucer (CPSO#: 31559 )
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 513-5797

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Extension: 4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-8098
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd
Unit 1924
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre Orlean
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
Phone: 613 749 1242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1355 Bank St
suite 502
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 6135135797
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.A.S. Taucer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taucer (CPSO#: 31559 )
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 1924 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 513-5797

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIANO ANTONIO STEFANO TAUCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUCER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIANO ANTONIO STEFANO TAUCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAUCER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979