THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:22:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 184 Willingdon Avenue
Student Wellness Services 69 Union St. Kingston, ON K7L 2N9 Canada
Queens Student Wellness Service
69 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-539-3488
Fax: 613-533-6740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Joseph Burley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Burley (CPSO#: 31560 )
Business Address: Prince Edward County Family Health Team
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-0400 Extn: 203

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 184 Willingdon Avenue
Student Wellness Services 69 Union St. Kingston, ON K7L 2N9 Canada
Queens Student Wellness Service
69 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-539-3488
Fax: 613-533-6740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Joseph Burley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Burley (CPSO#: 31560 )
Business Address: Prince Edward County Family Health Team
35 Bridge Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-0400 Extn: 203

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JOSEPH BURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD JOSEPH BURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978