THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
927 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 650-0006
Fax: (519) 650-6060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 21 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hem C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jain (CPSO#: 31572 )
Business Address: 302-927 King St E
Cambridge ON N3H 3P4

Corporation Name: Dr. H.C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
927 King Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3H 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 650-0006
Fax: (519) 650-6060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 21 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hem C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jain (CPSO#: 31572 )
Business Address: 302-927 King St E
Cambridge ON N3H 3P4

Corporation Name: Dr. H.C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEM CHAND JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEM CHAND JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979