THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 05:51:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: 4166340001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Holly Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 4164868088
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9
Phone: 4166307388
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
Phone: 4166385889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M2M 3T3
Phone: 4162225501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kassam (CPSO#: 31607 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(866) 803-6415
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
Toronto Ontario M3J 2G6
Phone: 4166340001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 40 Holly Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 4164868088
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 201
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9
Phone: 4166307388
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8
Phone: 4166385889
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5734 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M2M 3T3
Phone: 4162225501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Kassam (CPSO#: 31607 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(866) 803-6415
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 259-6671

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZARINA KARMALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZARINA KARMALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1974