THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:05:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 1 PMB 292
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 918
3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 256
3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 562
5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Kucharczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kucharczyk (CPSO#: 31753 )
Business Address: Suite 562, 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Suite 918, 3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Suite 1PMB 286, NCSB
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4656
Business Address: Suite 256, 3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 1 PMB 292
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 918
3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 256
3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 562
5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Kucharczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kucharczyk (CPSO#: 31753 )
Business Address: Suite 562, 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Suite 918, 3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Suite 1PMB 286, NCSB
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4656
Business Address: Suite 256, 3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER KUCHARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARCZYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER KUCHARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARCZYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1980
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1980