THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:24:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 637 Davis Drive
Suite 100
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan R. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hess (CPSO#: 31772 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 637 Davis Drive
Suite 100
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan R. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hess (CPSO#: 31772 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN RAE HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN RAE HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979