THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-7469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey K. Jenkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jenkin (CPSO#: 31832 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-7469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey K. Jenkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jenkin (CPSO#: 31832 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY KERR JENKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY KERR JENKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978