THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:40:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Mcnabb street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 3C6
Phone: 705 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-5936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip J. Catania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Catania (CPSO#: 31907 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 759-1234
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 240 Mcnabb street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 3C6
Phone: 705 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-5936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip J. Catania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Catania (CPSO#: 31907 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN JAMES CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP JOHN JAMES CATANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATANIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1979