THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64136
Fax: (519) 646-6135
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A6
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Pavlosky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pavlosky (CPSO#: 31978 )
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A6
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 64136

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64136
Fax: (519) 646-6135
Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A6
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Durham-Memorial Site
LOCATION: Durham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Pavlosky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pavlosky (CPSO#: 31978 )
Business Address: Chatham Kent Health Alliance
12 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 1A6
(519) 352-6400
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 64136

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANK PAVLOSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVLOSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANK PAVLOSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVLOSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979