THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:51:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 414
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-9998
Fax: (905) 820-6361
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 586-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ostro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ostro (CPSO#: 32006 )
Business Address: Suite 414
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-9998

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 414
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-9998
Fax: (905) 820-6361
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 586-2626
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ostro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ostro (CPSO#: 32006 )
Business Address: Suite 414
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-9998

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JACOB OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JACOB OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979