THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 20:49:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 309
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167780000
Fax: 4167785852
Address: Toronto Cardiology Associates Inc.
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
Phone: (416) 465-5464
Fax: (416) 465-0445
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz (CPSO#: 32044 ) Dr. D. Feig (CPSO#: 50539 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E4
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 778-0000
Business Address: 837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
(416) 465-5464

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 309
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167780000
Fax: 4167785852
Address: Toronto Cardiology Associates Inc.
837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
Phone: (416) 465-5464
Fax: (416) 465-0445
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lefkowitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lefkowitz (CPSO#: 32044 ) Dr. D. Feig (CPSO#: 50539 )
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E4
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 650 Sammon Avenue
K Wing
Suite 403
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M5
(416) 778-0000
Business Address: 837 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1L2
(416) 465-5464

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR CHARLES JOEL LEFKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFKOWITZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR CHARLES JOEL LEFKOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFKOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979