THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:44:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Pathology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 62008
Fax: (416) 242-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Savita Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 32165 )
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
Pathology Department
Room 2E, 2108
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 62008

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Pune, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Pathology
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 62008
Fax: (416) 242-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Savita Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 32165 )
Business Address: Humber River Regional Hospital
Pathology Department
Room 2E, 2108
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000 Extn: 62008

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVITA SATISH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAVITA SATISH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1974