THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:13:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162474947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond Street
St Michael's Hospital
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Morgenthau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morgenthau (CPSO#: 32166 )

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Morgenthau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162474947
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond Street
St Michael's Hospital
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 5377
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 19 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Morgenthau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morgenthau (CPSO#: 32166 )

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Morgenthau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD MORGENTHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGENTHAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RICHARD MORGENTHAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGENTHAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979