THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences General Di
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L2L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A.Skala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Skala (CPSO#: 32176 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Ananesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
(905) 575-5743
Business Address: GI Health Centre
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
(905) 335-1888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences General Di
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L2L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A.Skala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Skala (CPSO#: 32176 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Ananesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
(905) 575-5743
Business Address: GI Health Centre
Suite 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
(905) 335-1888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY SKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY SKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980