THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Higginson, Margaret Jane (Used Until: 28 Nov 2001)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glassco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Glassco (CPSO#: 32182 )

Corporation Name: Glassco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: Higginson, Margaret Jane (Used Until: 28 Nov 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glassco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Glassco (CPSO#: 32182 )

Corporation Name: Glassco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 1981