THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1971
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Kingsview Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-3308
Fax: (416) 246-9000
Address: Suite 1515
105 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1G6
Phone: (905) 528-3855
Fax: (905) 528-3868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bishay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bishay (CPSO#: 32212 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Kingsview Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 244-3308
Fax: (416) 246-9000
Address: Suite 1515
105 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1G6
Phone: (905) 528-3855
Fax: (905) 528-3868

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bishay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bishay (CPSO#: 32212 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZHAR FARID BISHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AZHAR FARID BISHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979