THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:08:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6366
Fax: 519 646 6418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry H. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Allen (CPSO#: 32229 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6366
Fax: 519 646 6418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry H. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Allen (CPSO#: 32229 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Care
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY HUGH ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY HUGH ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Oct 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1981