THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:33:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61Queen Street 3rd Floor
Family Practice Unit
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. MINTZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mintz (CPSO#: 32237 )
Business Address: 61 Queen St E
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 61Queen Street 3rd Floor
Family Practice Unit
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. MINTZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mintz (CPSO#: 32237 )
Business Address: 61 Queen St E
3rd Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON YVETTE MINTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON YVETTE MINTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1981