THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2920 Lawrence Ave E
Bendale Acres Long Term Care and Services
Scarborough ON M1P 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 3977062
Fax: 416 3977067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Y. T. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li (CPSO#: 32261 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 603
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 266-4543

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2920 Lawrence Ave E
Bendale Acres Long Term Care and Services
Scarborough ON M1P 2T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 3977062
Fax: 416 3977067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Y. T. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Li (CPSO#: 32261 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 603
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 266-4543

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD YEUK-TAK LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD YEUK-TAK LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979