THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: K W Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 748-2327
Fax: (519) 748-2576
Address: 10 Alpen Grove
Heidelberg Ontario N0B 2M1
Phone: (519) 699-4017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria St. South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 745-2273
Fax: (519) 745-1871

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. L. Kordish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kordish (CPSO#: 32308 )
Business Address: KW Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Suite 9
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: K W Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 748-2327
Fax: (519) 748-2576
Address: 10 Alpen Grove
Heidelberg Ontario N0B 2M1
Phone: (519) 699-4017
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 751 Victoria St. South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 745-2273
Fax: (519) 745-1871

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. L. Kordish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kordish (CPSO#: 32308 )
Business Address: KW Urgent Care Clinic
385 Fairway Road South
Suite 9
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LOUIS KORDISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL LOUIS KORDISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1979