THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-550 Fennell Ave E
Hamilton ON L8V 4S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-549-7326
Extension: 0
Fax: 905-549-9661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 02 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordina Elizabeth Savelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Savelli (CPSO#: 32332 )
Business Address: 730 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
(905) 549-7326

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-550 Fennell Ave E
Hamilton ON L8V 4S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-549-7326
Extension: 0
Fax: 905-549-9661

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 02 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordina Elizabeth Savelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Savelli (CPSO#: 32332 )
Business Address: 730 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C1
(905) 549-7326

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDINA ELIZABETH SAVELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDINA ELIZABETH SAVELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975