THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:31:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue, Room 918
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4555
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Address: 250 College St
Toronto ON
Toronto Ontario M5S 2S1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Molyn Leszcz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leszcz (CPSO#: 32416 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 918 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue, Room 918
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4555
Fax: (416) 586-8654
Address: 250 College St
Toronto ON
Toronto Ontario M5S 2S1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Molyn Leszcz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leszcz (CPSO#: 32416 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 918 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOLYN LESZCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESZCZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOLYN LESZCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESZCZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978