THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:20:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135944935
Fax: 3433127296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine (CPSO#: 32462 )
Business Address: 149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1S 2H6
(613) 594-4935

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135944935
Fax: 3433127296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine (CPSO#: 32462 )
Business Address: 149 Second Avenue
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1S 2H6
(613) 594-4935

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD HAROLD LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD HAROLD LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980