THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
381 Church Street, P O Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: (905) 472-7086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Austin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Austin (CPSO#: 32464 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Administration
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
381 Church Street, P O Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: (905) 472-7086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Austin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Austin (CPSO#: 32464 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Administration
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980