THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-2345
Fax: 416-633-2216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leonard Direnfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Direnfeld (CPSO#: 32505 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-2345
Fax: 416-633-2216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leonard Direnfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Direnfeld (CPSO#: 32505 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD JOEL DIRENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRENFELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD JOEL DIRENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRENFELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980