THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma St
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: 8665396714

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Hastings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hastings (CPSO#: 32594 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
207 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
(519) 354-2172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Chatham Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma St
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: 8665396714

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Hastings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hastings (CPSO#: 32594 )
Business Address: Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
207 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham Ontario N7L 5K5
(519) 354-2172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD KEVIN HASTINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASTINGS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD KEVIN HASTINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASTINGS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2017
Summary:
Effective June 14, 2019, Dr. Hastings has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2017
Summary:
Effective June 14, 2019, Dr. Hastings has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980