THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, INDONESIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 _884-6119
Fax: 905-884-0528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bok Lan The Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. B. The (CPSO#: 32626 )
Business Address: 1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
905-884-6119

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, INDONESIAN
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 _884-6119
Fax: 905-884-0528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bok Lan The Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. B. The (CPSO#: 32626 )
Business Address: 1600 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 4M2
905-884-6119

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOK LAN THE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOK LAN THE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1981

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978