THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:44:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Robinson, Virginia Mary (Used Until: 03 Oct 1999)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Virginia Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Griffin (CPSO#: 32647 )
Business Address: 301 - 2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 785-5001

General Information

Former Name: Robinson, Virginia Mary (Used Until: 03 Oct 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Virginia Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Griffin (CPSO#: 32647 )
Business Address: 301 - 2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7
(416) 785-5001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRGINIA MARY GRIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRGINIA MARY GRIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1981
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1981