THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:53:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
111 Main Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 476-7747
Fax: (705) 476-9373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Graham (CPSO#: 32681 )
Business Address: 304 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
(705) 476-7747

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 304
111 Main Street
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 476-7747
Fax: (705) 476-9373

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Graham (CPSO#: 32681 )
Business Address: 304 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay Ontario P1B 2T6
(705) 476-7747

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY CALVIN GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY CALVIN GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980