THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit E
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-5911
Fax: (705) 524-7954
Address: St Joseph's Villa
1250 South Bay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6L9
Phone: 705-674-4447
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pioneer Manor
960 Notre Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 566-4270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Complex Continuing Care
1140 South Bay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6
Phone: 705-674-2846
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NEOMO Medical
885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
Phone: 705-586-3601
Fax: 705-586-3602

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maurice St. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. St Martin (CPSO#: 32682 )
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit E
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 566-4270
Business Address: St Joseph Complex Continuing Care
1140 Southbay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit E
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 524-5911
Fax: (705) 524-7954
Address: St Joseph's Villa
1250 South Bay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6L9
Phone: 705-674-4447
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pioneer Manor
960 Notre Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 566-4270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Complex Continuing Care
1140 South Bay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6
Phone: 705-674-2846
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NEOMO Medical
885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
Phone: 705-586-3601
Fax: 705-586-3602

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre Sudbury
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maurice St. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. M. St Martin (CPSO#: 32682 )
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit E
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 566-4270
Business Address: St Joseph Complex Continuing Care
1140 Southbay Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 0B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAURICE ST MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAURICE ST MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980