THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:02:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 108
245 Pelham Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 988-1223
Fax: (905) 988-3783

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A. Paolone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paolone (CPSO#: 32712 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 108
245 Pelham Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 988-1223
Fax: (905) 988-3783

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A. Paolone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Paolone (CPSO#: 32712 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
14 Sep 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., September 14, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. John Anthony Paolone:

(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
College-facilitated instruction in Ethic within 12 months of this
Order; and

(ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months
of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his
medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12
months of his completion of the record-keeping course.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., September 14, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. John Anthony Paolone:

(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
College-facilitated instruction in Ethic within 12 months of this
Order; and

(ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete
College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months
of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his
medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12
months of his completion of the record-keeping course.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Sep 2012
Summary of Decision:
The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts.

 Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Paolone’s admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Therefore, having stated the finding in paragraph 1 of its written order of September 14, 2012, on the matter of penalty and costs, the Committee ordered and directed that:

2. Dr. Paolone attend before this panel to be reprimanded.

3. the Registrar suspend Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to commence Monday, September 17, 2012.

4. the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Ethics within 12 months of this Order; and

(ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12 months of his completion of the record-keeping course.

5. Dr. Paolone pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 14, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 14 Sep 2012
Summary of Decision:
The Committee accepted as true all of the facts set out in the Agreed Statement of Facts.

 Having regard to these facts, the Committee accepted Dr. Paolone’s admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Therefore, having stated the finding in paragraph 1 of its written order of September 14, 2012, on the matter of penalty and costs, the Committee ordered and directed that:

2. Dr. Paolone attend before this panel to be reprimanded.

3. the Registrar suspend Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to commence Monday, September 17, 2012.

4. the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Paolone’s certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Ethics within 12 months of this Order; and

(ii) Dr. Paolone shall, at his own expense, successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Record-Keeping within 12 months of this Order, and shall cooperate with a re-assessment of his medical records by representatives of the College within 6-12 months of his completion of the record-keeping course.

5. Dr. Paolone pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 14, 2012

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 17 Oct 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1981