THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:16:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CMA - Limebank Imaging
4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester Ontario K1X 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 699-0162
Fax: (613) 692-0732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sargon Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandilo (CPSO#: 32722 )
Business Address: B2 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7K2
Business Address: 150 Katimavik Road
Suite 102
Kanata Ontario K2L 2N2
Business Address: 2246 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
Business Address: 1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 106
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 723-5215
Business Address: 4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester Ontario K1X 1E8
(613) 425-0588
Business Address: 5288 Knott Cres
Manotick ON K4M 1C2
613-263-0823

Corporation Name: Sargon B. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CMA - Limebank Imaging
4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester Ontario K1X 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 699-0162
Fax: (613) 692-0732

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sargon Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandilo (CPSO#: 32722 )
Business Address: B2 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 7K2
Business Address: 150 Katimavik Road
Suite 102
Kanata Ontario K2L 2N2
Business Address: 2246 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
Business Address: 1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 106
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 723-5215
Business Address: 4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester Ontario K1X 1E8
(613) 425-0588
Business Address: 5288 Knott Cres
Manotick ON K4M 1C2
613-263-0823

Corporation Name: Sargon B. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARGON BENJAMIN GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARGON BENJAMIN GANDILO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDILO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1973
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 1973