THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:04:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
2900 Steeles ave., East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-1482
Fax: 905-731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Kornhauser Medicine Profession Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kornhauser (CPSO#: 32727 )
Business Address: 905-709-1482

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Kornhauser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
2900 Steeles ave., East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-709-1482
Fax: 905-731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Kornhauser Medicine Profession Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kornhauser (CPSO#: 32727 )
Business Address: 905-709-1482

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny Kornhauser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY SHLOMO KORNHAUSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORNHAUSER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY SHLOMO KORNHAUSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORNHAUSER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980