THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 4S-446
Sunnyside Bulding
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6759
Fax: (416) 530-6725
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Neonatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5879
Fax: (416) 813-5295

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mehta (CPSO#: 33042 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
4S-446 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 4S-446
Sunnyside Bulding
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6759
Fax: (416) 530-6725
Address: Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Neonatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5879
Fax: (416) 813-5295

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mehta (CPSO#: 33042 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
4S-446 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6759

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILIPKUMAR HIRALAL MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILIPKUMAR HIRALAL MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1982