THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:58:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Kenneth Ave
FlowLabs
Oshawa ON L1G 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054045454
Fax: 9054041096
Address: 22 Chestnut Park Rd
Toronto ON M4W 1W6
Phone: 4164506603
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 08 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mullen (CPSO#: 33047 )
Business Address: 22 Chestnut Park Rd
Toronto ON M4W 1W6
416-450-6603
Business Address: 65 Kenneth Ave
FlowLabs
Oshawa ON L1G 5N3
9054045454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Kenneth Ave
FlowLabs
Oshawa ON L1G 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054045454
Fax: 9054041096
Address: 22 Chestnut Park Rd
Toronto ON M4W 1W6
Phone: 4164506603
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 08 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mullen (CPSO#: 33047 )
Business Address: 22 Chestnut Park Rd
Toronto ON M4W 1W6
416-450-6603
Business Address: 65 Kenneth Ave
FlowLabs
Oshawa ON L1G 5N3
9054045454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BRENDAN MAURICE MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BRENDAN MAURICE MULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1977