THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 612 6072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Litwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Litwin (CPSO#: 33134 )
Business Address: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
613 612 6072

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 612 6072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Litwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Litwin (CPSO#: 33134 )
Business Address: 202-149 Second Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2H6
613 612 6072

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHLOMO LITWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITWIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHLOMO LITWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITWIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1978