THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:32:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5410
Extension: Ext 1
Fax: (416)864-5117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ori Rotstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Rotstein (CPSO#: 33160 )
Business Address: LKS 3-3305
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5410
Extension: Ext 1
Fax: (416)864-5117

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ori Rotstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Rotstein (CPSO#: 33160 )
Business Address: LKS 3-3305
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORI DAVID ROTSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ORI DAVID ROTSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977