THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1057 Main Street West
Suite L02
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059205611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Van Ameringen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Ameringen (CPSO#: 33188 )
Business Address: MacAnxiety Research Centre
Suite L02
1057 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
(905) 920-5611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1057 Main Street West
Suite L02
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9059205611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Van Ameringen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Ameringen (CPSO#: 33188 )
Business Address: MacAnxiety Research Centre
Suite L02
1057 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1B7
(905) 920-5611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTON VAN AMERINGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN AMERINGEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTON VAN AMERINGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN AMERINGEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1982