THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:07:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite129 - 11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6050
Fax: (519) 956-9998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Shaban Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shaban (CPSO#: 33214 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Western Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 129 - 11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
(519) 977-6050
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite129 - 11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6050
Fax: (519) 956-9998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 04 Sep 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Shaban Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shaban (CPSO#: 33214 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Western Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 129 - 11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
(519) 977-6050
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ABDUL-HALIM SHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ABDUL-HALIM SHABAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHABAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1980