THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:38:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 3850
Fax: (705) 495-7983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Bodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bodley (CPSO#: 33302 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 3850
Fax: (705) 495-7983

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Bodley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bodley (CPSO#: 33302 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN CHRISTOPHER BODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN CHRISTOPHER BODLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981