THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Extension: 4732
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown (CPSO#: 33310 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2573

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Extension: 4732
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown (CPSO#: 33310 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-2573

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MAURICE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MAURICE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1975