THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:00:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard at Yonge
Thornhill Ontario L3T 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-1661
Fax: (905) 881-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Blitzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blitzer (CPSO#: 33351 )
Business Address: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill Ontario L3T 3C3
(905) 881-1661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard at Yonge
Thornhill Ontario L3T 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-1661
Fax: (905) 881-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Blitzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blitzer (CPSO#: 33351 )
Business Address: 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Thornhill Ontario L3T 3C3
(905) 881-1661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVE ARTHUR BLITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVE ARTHUR BLITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981