THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3101 Bloor Street West
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M8X 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 239-1968
Fax: (416) 233-4763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.L. Abel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abel (CPSO#: 33393 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3101 Bloor Street West
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M8X 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 239-1968
Fax: (416) 233-4763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.L. Abel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abel (CPSO#: 33393 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SELWYN LEIGH ABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SELWYN LEIGH ABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980